Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 959 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 2033 Week
» 27394 Month
» 260314 Year
» 1925690 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Taff Vale Railway 119 m/e 10/1910
Great Western Railway (1922) 324 4w/e 10/1922
Great Western Railway (1946) 216 on 31/03/1948 (At Caerphilly Factory)

Locomotive Specifics
Designer T. Hurry Riches
Class O4
Company History TVR/GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Beyer Peacock Ltd.
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 5392
To Service During 10/1910
Withdrawal Mon 24/01/1955
Service Life 44 yrs, 3 mths , 25 dys
Total Mileage 741,351

Disposal
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Swindon)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 10/1910
CVFDL     8w/e 23/03/1946
88F   Treherbert 4w/e 17/06/1950
88F   Treherbert 4w/e 08/09/1951
     Withdrawn on 24/01/1955

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC FDL Ferndale 4w/e 23/02/1946
ALLOC 88F Treherbert 4w/e 17/06/1950
ALLOC 88F Treherbert 4w/e 08/09/1951
ALLOC 88E Abercynon 4w/e 18/04/1953
ALLOC 88B Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 03/10/1953
WDN   m/e 31/01/1955

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/03/1948 General Further locomotives noted carrying the prefix 'W' with blank tanks or tender sides were:-Nos. 33, 216/63, 393, 1141, 1993, 2048, 5388, 5625, 6703, 7751/68, while those lettered 'British Railways' were:-Nos. 361, 3103, 4217, 4533, 5035/99, 5257, 5520, 5641/52/55 an 6964. Nos. 271, 4206 an 5958 had been prefixed, but still carried 'G.W.R.' SLS/194805

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1910 To Service To service as Taff Vale Railway Number 119
Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 5392
   
10/1922 Renumbered Renumbered to 324    
23/03/1946 Allocation      
31/03/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 216    
17/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Treherbert (88F)    
08/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Treherbert (88F)    
24/01/1955 Withdrawn Condemned as 216    

prev prev