Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 3603 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17009 Week
» 70025 Month
» 189552 Year
» 3216405 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13243 |
09/03/1956 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3243 |
29/10/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08175 |
12/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
by 05/1970 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
09/03/1956 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Components
Fitted |
Component |
Details |
Removed |
Reason Removed |
09/03/1956 |
Power Unit IH3476 |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/03/1956 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13243 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
16/06/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Percy Main (52E) |
|
|
13/12/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Heaton (52B) |
|
|
29/10/1960 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3243 |
|
|
08/06/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Percy Main (52E) |
|
|
14/08/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
05/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
|
|
22/01/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B) |
|
|
25/11/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Grangemouth (65F) |
|
|
12/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08175 |
|
|
11/12/1978 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08175 from Grangemouth (GM) |
|
|
12/1985 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by J R Adams: Glasgow |
|
|