Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 916 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14322 Week
» 67338 Month
» 186865 Year
» 3213718 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13249 |
18/05/1956 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3249 |
04/03/1961 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08181 |
09/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
18/05/1956 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
18/05/1956 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13249 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
26/01/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood East (14A) |
|
|
04/03/1961 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3249 |
|
|
14/10/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Burton (16F) |
|
|
28/02/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (16A) |
|
|
09/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08181 |
|
|
04/07/1982 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08181 from Derby (DY) |
|
|
24/11/1984 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|