Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 1533 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19336 Week
» 72352 Month
» 191879 Year
» 3218732 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13264 |
20/08/1956 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3264 |
08/09/1961 |
At Swindon Factory |
TOPS (Tops) |
08194 |
04/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
20/08/1956 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
20/08/1956 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13264 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Duffryn Yard (87B) |
|
|
01/12/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neath (Court Sart) (87A) |
|
|
10/08/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88B) |
|
|
08/09/1961 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3264 |
|
|
03/11/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88M) |
|
|
29/11/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08194 |
|
|
09/11/1980 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08194 from Cardiff Canton (CF) |
|
|
29/10/1983 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|