Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 921 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14327 Week
» 67343 Month
» 186870 Year
» 3213723 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13281 |
10/11/1956 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3281 |
02/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08211 |
03/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
10/11/1956 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/11/1956 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13281 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Grangemouth (65F) |
|
|
02/1960 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3281 |
|
|
08/10/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Healey Mills (56B) |
|
|
28/12/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) |
|
|
26/01/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Frodingham (36C) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08211 |
|
|
20/11/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (TE) |
|
|
03/1977 |
To Store |
To Store (Darlington) |
|
|
04/1977 |
Reinstated |
Reinstated to Thornaby (TE) |
|
|
03/03/1985 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08211 from Thornaby (TE) |
|
|
03/1986 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|