Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 3752 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17158 Week
» 70174 Month
» 189701 Year
» 3216554 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13282 |
16/11/1956 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3282 |
31/12/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08212 |
09/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
16/11/1956 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
16/11/1956 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13282 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Motherwell (66B) |
|
|
31/12/1959 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3282 |
|
|
16/03/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hamilton (West) (66C) |
|
|
09/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08212 |
|
|
16/11/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (TE) |
|
|
06/09/1981 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08212 from Thornaby (TE) |
|
|
02/1982 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|