Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 34 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 4661 Week
» 6399 Month
» 133842 Year
» 1799218 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Post 1948 (1955 Num) 13283 16/11/1956  
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3283 11/02/1961  
TOPS (Tops) 08213 03/1974  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 08
Subclass/Rebuild History
ClassFrom
0816/11/1956
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Derby Works
To Service 16/11/1956 to Motherwell (66B)
Withdrawn 02/11/1980 off Allerton (AN)
Time in Service 23 yrs, 11 mths , 17 dys
Cut Up 01/08/1981
Cut At Locomotive Works (Swindon)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
66B Motherwell (New) on 16/11/1956
66C Hamilton (West) 4w/e 06/06/1959
66A Polmadie 4w/e 26/09/1959
66B Motherwell 4w/e 11/03/1961
66C Hamilton (West) 4w/e 16/03/1963
12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 05/11/1966
12A Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 04/03/1967
12C Barrow in Furness w/e 03/01/1970
12A Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 06/05/1972
8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 2w/e 05/08/1972
NH Newton Heath w/e 08/12/1973
   Withdrawn on 02/11/1980


Summary
Start Event Details Source See Also
16/11/1956 To Service To service as British Railways Number 13283
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to Motherwell (66B)
   
06/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Hamilton (West) (66C)    
26/09/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Polmadie (66A)    
11/02/1961 Renumbered Renumbered to 3283    
11/03/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Motherwell (66B)    
16/03/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Hamilton (West) (66C)    
05/11/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12B)    
04/03/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A)    
03/01/1970 Allocation Reallocated to Barrow in Furness (12C)    
06/05/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A)    
05/08/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
08/12/1973 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (NH)    
03/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 08213    
02/11/1980 Withdrawn Condemned as 08213 from Allerton (AN)    
01/08/1981 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon    

prev prev