Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 1835 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19638 Week
» 72654 Month
» 192181 Year
» 3219034 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13318 |
09/10/1956 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3318 |
04/10/1958 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08248 |
03/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
09/10/1956 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Components
Fitted |
Component |
Details |
Removed |
Reason Removed |
09/10/1956 |
Power Unit IH3523 |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/10/1956 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13318 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
04/10/1958 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3318 |
|
|
15/09/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (50B) |
|
|
26/09/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Botanic Gardens (50C) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08248 |
|
|
23/09/1984 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08248 from Hull Botanic Gardens (BG) |
|
|
13/07/1985 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|