Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 967 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 2041 Week
» 27402 Month
» 260322 Year
» 1925698 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Taff Vale Railway 121 m/e 10/1910
Great Western Railway (1922) 333 4w/e 10/1922
Great Western Railway (1946) 217 on 13/04/1949 (At Caerphilly Factory)

Locomotive Specifics
Designer T. Hurry Riches
Class O4
Company History TVR/GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Beyer Peacock Ltd.
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 5393
To Service During 10/1910
Withdrawal Mon 08/09/1952
Service Life 41 yrs, 11 mths , 9 dys
Total Mileage 685,266

Disposal
Scrapping Sat 01/11/1952 at Locomotive Works (Swindon)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 10/1910
88F   Treherbert 3w/e 17/05/1952
     Withdrawn on 08/09/1952

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 88F Treherbert 4w/e 17/05/1952
WDN   m/e 30/09/1952

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1910 To Service To service as Taff Vale Railway Number 121
Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 5393
   
10/1922 Renumbered Renumbered to 333    
13/04/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 217    
17/05/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Treherbert (88F)    
08/09/1952 Withdrawn Condemned as 217    
01/11/1952 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon    

prev prev