Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 535 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 3461 Week
» 5199 Month
» 132642 Year
» 1798018 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Post 1948 (1955 Num) 13335 30/01/1957  
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3335 02/1959  
TOPS (Tops) 08265 03/1974  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 08
Subclass/Rebuild History
ClassFrom
0830/01/1957
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
To Service 30/01/1957 to Sheffield Darnall (41A)
Withdrawn 31/12/1981 off Springs Branch (Wigan) (SP)
Time in Service 24 yrs, 11 mths , 1 dy
Cut Up 30/04/1987
Cut At Locomotive Works (Swindon)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
41A Sheffield Darnall (New) on 30/01/1957
36B Mexborough 4w/e 18/05/1957
41A Sheffield Darnall 5w/e 15/11/1958
9G Gorton w/e 05/05/1962
9A Longsight w/e 12/06/1965
9D Newton Heath w/e 07/01/1967
9A Longsight w/e 06/07/1968
8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 09/10/1971
   Withdrawn on 31/12/1981


Summary
Start Event Details Source See Also
30/01/1957 To Service To service as British Railways Number 13335
Built at Darlington Works
Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A)
   
18/05/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (36B)    
15/11/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A)    
02/1959 Renumbered Renumbered to 3335    
05/05/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (9G)    
12/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Longsight (9A)    
07/01/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (9D)    
06/07/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Longsight (9A)    
09/10/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
03/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 08265    
31/12/1981 Withdrawn Condemned as 08265 from Springs Branch (Wigan) (SP)    
30/04/1987 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon    

prev prev