Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1232 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19035 Week
» 72051 Month
» 191578 Year
» 3218431 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13340 |
30/03/1957 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3340 |
05/1961 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08270 |
09/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
30/03/1957 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
30/03/1957 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13340 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Thornton Junction (62A) |
|
|
05/1961 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3340 |
|
|
09/03/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (16C) |
|
|
13/04/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (16A) |
|
|
09/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08270 |
|
|
19/12/1982 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08270 from Allerton (AN) |
|
|
07/01/1984 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|