Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 767 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14173 Week
» 67189 Month
» 186716 Year
» 3213569 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13343 |
12/04/1957 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3343 |
23/12/1961 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08273 |
03/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 12/1975 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
12/04/1957 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/04/1957 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13343 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Dunfermline Upper (62C) |
|
|
23/12/1961 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3343 |
|
|
28/12/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (62B) |
|
|
06/12/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Allerton (8J) |
|
|
05/08/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08273 |
|
|
12/1975 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
19/12/1982 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08273 from Allerton (AN) |
|
|
24/03/1984 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|