Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 9 Online
» 693 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14099 Week
» 67115 Month
» 186642 Year
» 3213495 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3369 |
26/07/1957 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08299 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 12/1975 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
26/07/1957 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
26/07/1957 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3369 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (10A) |
|
|
04/10/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Preston (24K) |
|
|
16/09/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lostock Hall (24C) |
|
|
06/05/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08299 |
|
|
12/1975 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
19/07/1981 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08299 from Springs Branch (Wigan) (SP) |
|
|
10/1982 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|