Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 775 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14181 Week
» 67197 Month
» 186724 Year
» 3213577 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D337 |
24/03/1961 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
40137 |
02/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
40 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
1Co-Co1 |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4625 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Split Headcode Box |
|
To Service |
24/03/1961 to Crewe North (5A) |
Withdrawn |
04/01/1981 |
Time in Service |
19 yrs, 9 mths , 11 dys |
Cut Up |
12/1981 |
Cut At |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
Information |
Required works repairs,surplus to requirements,spares |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
All over Green including front of cab |
24/03/1961 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
by 08/1968 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 06/01/1970 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
06/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
by 30/08/1970 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
02/1975 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
02/1975 |
|
EQ Brakes Removed |
|
|
|
|
by 03/1978 |
|
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
|
|
03/1980 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
24/03/1961 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 06/01/1970 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
06/1970 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
by 30/08/1970 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
02/1975 |
xi |
Dual brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
03/1980 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
24/03/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D337 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Crewe North (5A) Livery applied: All over Green including front of cab |
|
|
03/07/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bletchley (1E) |
|
|
18/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
08/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
10/05/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Manchester Division (D09) |
|
|
06/01/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
06/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
30/08/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
05/02/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Liverpool Division (D08) |
|
|
11/08/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (KM) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 40137 |
|
|
10/08/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (SP) |
|
|
12/10/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (LO) |
|
|
11/01/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (KD) |
|
|
02/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
02/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Removed |
|
|
03/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
03/1980 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
04/01/1981 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 40137 |
|
|
12/1981 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|