Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 3752 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17158 Week
» 70174 Month
» 189701 Year
» 3216554 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3371 |
07/08/1957 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08301 |
02/1974 |
|
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
21/09/1968 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
07/08/1957 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
21/09/1968 |
x |
Dual brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/08/1957 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3371 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (10A) |
|
|
04/10/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Preston (24K) |
|
|
16/09/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lostock Hall (24C) |
|
|
21/09/1968 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
06/05/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08301 |
|
|
31/12/1981 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08301 from Springs Branch (Wigan) (SP) |
|
|
22/06/1985 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|