Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 531 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 3457 Week
» 5195 Month
» 132638 Year
» 1798014 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3372 10/08/1957  
TOPS (Tops) 08302 03/1974  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 08
Subclass/Rebuild History
ClassFrom
0810/08/1957
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Derby Works
To Service 10/08/1957 to Newton Heath (26A)
Withdrawn 29/06/1981 off Springs Branch (Wigan) (SP)
Time in Service 23 yrs, 10 mths , 19 dys
Cut Up 01/02/1982
Cut At Locomotive Works (Swindon)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
26A Newton Heath (New) on 10/08/1957
9A Longsight w/e 06/07/1968
8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 09/10/1971
   Withdrawn on 29/06/1981


Summary
Start Event Details Source See Also
10/08/1957 To Service To service as British Railways Number 3372
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to Newton Heath (26A)
   
06/07/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Longsight (9A)    
09/10/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
03/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 08302    
29/06/1981 Withdrawn Condemned as 08302 from Springs Branch (Wigan) (SP)    
01/02/1982 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon    

prev prev