Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 497 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 3423 Week
» 5161 Month
» 132604 Year
» 1797980 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3373 15/08/1957  
TOPS (Tops) 08303 02/1974  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 08
Subclass/Rebuild History
ClassFrom
0815/08/1957
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Derby Works
To Service 15/08/1957 to Newton Heath (26A)
Withdrawn 31/12/1981 off Derby (DY)
Time in Service 24 yrs, 4 mths , 16 dys
Cut Up 31/03/1987
Cut At Locomotive Works (Swindon)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
26A Newton Heath (New) on 15/08/1957
9A Longsight w/e 06/07/1968
8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 09/10/1971
DY Derby 3w/e 20/12/1975
   Withdrawn on 31/12/1981


Summary
Start Event Details Source See Also
15/08/1957 To Service To service as British Railways Number 3373
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to Newton Heath (26A)
   
06/07/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Longsight (9A)    
09/10/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
02/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 08303    
20/12/1975 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (DY)    
31/12/1981 Withdrawn Condemned as 08303 from Derby (DY)    
31/03/1987 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon    

prev prev