Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 35 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 4662 Week
» 6400 Month
» 133843 Year
» 1799219 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3374 16/08/1957  
TOPS (Tops) 08304 03/1974  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 08
Subclass/Rebuild History
ClassFrom
0816/08/1957
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Derby Works
To Service 16/08/1957 to Newton Heath (26A)
Withdrawn 19/05/1985 off Lincoln (LN)
Time in Service 27 yrs, 9 mths , 3 dys
Cut Up 01/12/1986
Cut At Locomotive Works (Swindon)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
26A Newton Heath (New) on 16/08/1957
24C Lostock Hall 4w/e 04/10/1958
8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 06/05/1972
   Withdrawn on 19/05/1985


Summary
Start Event Details Source See Also
16/08/1957 To Service To service as British Railways Number 3374
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to Newton Heath (26A)
   
04/10/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Lostock Hall (24C)    
06/05/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
03/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 08304    
19/05/1985 Withdrawn Condemned as 08304 from Lincoln (LN)    
01/12/1986 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon    

prev prev