Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 2119 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19922 Week
» 72938 Month
» 192465 Year
» 3219318 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D338 |
29/03/1961 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
40138 |
02/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
40 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
1Co-Co1 |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Works Number |
3084/D634 |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4625 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Split Headcode Box |
|
To Service |
29/03/1961 to Crewe North (5A) |
Withdrawn |
03/09/1982 |
Time in Service |
21 yrs, 5 mths , 5 dys |
Cut Up |
02/1984 |
Cut At |
Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) |
Information |
Spares |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
All over Green including front of cab |
29/03/1961 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
by 08/1968 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 06/01/1970 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
02/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
by 30/08/1970 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
by 01/1979 |
|
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
29/03/1961 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 06/01/1970 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
02/1970 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
by 30/08/1970 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
25/08/1964 |
Severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
|
|
03/09/1964 |
Severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
29/03/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D338 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 3084 Allocated to Crewe North (5A) Livery applied: All over Green including front of cab |
|
|
18/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
08/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
09/11/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Liverpool Division (D08) |
|
|
06/01/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
02/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
30/08/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
11/08/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (KM) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 40138 |
|
|
06/07/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (SP) |
|
|
12/10/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (LO) |
|
|
11/01/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (KD) |
|
|
01/1979 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
03/09/1982 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 40138 |
|
|
02/1984 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Crewe, Cheshire |
|
|