Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 32 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17835 Week
» 70851 Month
» 190378 Year
» 3217231 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3397 |
08/11/1957 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08327 |
03/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
by 07/1971 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
12/1972 |
|
Radio telephone fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
08/11/1957 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
12/1972 |
vr |
Vacuum brakes, Radio Telephone fitted |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/11/1957 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3397 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Cardiff East Dock (88B) |
|
|
03/11/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88M) |
|
|
29/11/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
28/08/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86B) |
|
|
31/05/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87E) |
|
|
02/03/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (2F) |
|
|
18/03/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To London Midland Region (91M) |
|
|
07/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
|
|
12/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Radio telephone fitted |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08327 |
|
|
28/02/1983 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08327 from Bescot (BS) |
|
|
28/02/1987 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|