Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 1840 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19643 Week
» 72659 Month
» 192186 Year
» 3219039 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3401 |
23/11/1957 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08331 |
02/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
08 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
23/11/1957 to Cardiff East Dock (88B) |
Withdrawn |
14/03/1988 |
Time in Service |
30 yrs, 3 mths , 20 dys |
Cut Up |
04/05/1989 |
Status |
Awaiting Scrapping |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
23/11/1957 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
23/11/1957 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3401 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Cardiff East Dock (88B) |
|
|
03/11/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88M) |
|
|
29/06/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Danygraig (87C) |
|
|
13/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87E) |
|
|
18/03/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To North Eastern Region (91N) |
|
|
30/03/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
29/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Staveley (Barrow Hill) (41E) |
|
|
20/07/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To Eastern Region (91E) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08331 |
|
|
10/05/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Shirebrook (SB) |
|
|
08/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
31/10/1979 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (DR) |
|
|
14/03/1988 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08331 |
|
|
04/05/1989 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|