Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 27 Online
» 2528 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15934 Week
» 68950 Month
» 188477 Year
» 3215330 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3407 |
27/12/1957 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08337 |
03/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
by 07/1971 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
27/12/1957 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
27/12/1957 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3407 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Cardiff East Dock (88B) |
|
|
03/11/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88M) |
|
|
29/11/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
20/07/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (16C) |
|
|
27/07/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (16B) |
|
|
27/07/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To London Midland Region (91M) |
|
|
18/04/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
07/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
|
|
13/11/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08337 |
|
|
06/02/1987 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08337 from Doncaster (DR) |
|
|
04/05/1989 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by RFS Engineering Ltd: Doncaster Works |
|
|