Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 30 Online
» 2755 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16161 Week
» 69177 Month
» 188704 Year
» 3215557 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3412 |
24/01/1958 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08342 |
03/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
24/01/1958 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
24/01/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3412 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Yoker (65G) |
|
|
16/06/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kipps (65E) |
|
|
30/05/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) |
|
|
05/11/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A) |
|
|
26/11/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Barrow in Furness (12C) |
|
|
16/11/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lostock Hall (10D) |
|
|
06/05/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08342 |
|
|
04/07/1982 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08342 from Springs Branch (Wigan) (SP) |
|
|
05/11/1983 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|