Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 4221 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17627 Week
» 70643 Month
» 190170 Year
» 3217023 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D342 |
05/05/1961 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
40142 |
05/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
40 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
1Co-Co1 |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Works Number |
3088/D638 |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4625 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Split Headcode Box |
|
To Service |
05/05/1961 to Crewe North (5A) |
Withdrawn |
21/04/1980 |
Time in Service |
18 yrs, 11 mths , 16 dys |
Cut Up |
09/1983 |
Cut At |
Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
All over Green including front of cab |
05/05/1961 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
by 06/1969 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 06/01/1970 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
by 30/08/1970 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
by 09/1975 |
|
Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
05/05/1961 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 06/01/1970 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
by 30/08/1970 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
by 09/1975 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/05/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D342 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 3088 Allocated to Crewe North (5A) Livery applied: All over Green including front of cab |
|
|
18/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
13/01/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
09/03/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Liverpool Division (D08) |
|
|
06/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
06/01/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
30/08/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
05/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 40142 |
|
|
11/05/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (HA) |
|
|
09/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
21/04/1980 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 40142 |
|
|
09/1983 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Crewe, Cheshire |
|
|