Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 888 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18691 Week
» 71707 Month
» 191234 Year
» 3218087 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3423 |
18/01/1958 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08353 |
03/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
18/01/1958 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
18/01/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3423 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Cardiff East Dock (88B) |
|
|
03/11/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88M) |
|
|
29/11/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08353 |
|
|
05/07/1981 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08353 from Cardiff Canton (CF) |
|
|
03/1982 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|