Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 161 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17964 Week
» 70980 Month
» 190507 Year
» 3217360 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D343 |
10/05/1961 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
40143 |
10/12/1973 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
40 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
1Co-Co1 |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Works Number |
3089/D639 |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4625 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Split Headcode Box |
|
To Service |
10/05/1961 to Edge Hill (8A) |
Withdrawn |
22/01/1985 |
Time in Service |
23 yrs, 8 mths , 12 dys |
Cut Up |
09/1986 |
Cut At |
Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) |
Information |
Surplus to requirements, |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
All over Green including front of cab |
10/05/1961 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
01/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
by 06/01/1970 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
by 30/08/1970 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
12/1973 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
12/1973 |
|
EQ Brakes Removed |
|
|
|
|
by 12/1977 |
|
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
10/05/1961 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
01/1970 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
by 06/01/1970 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
by 30/08/1970 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
12/1973 |
xi |
Dual brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/05/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D343 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 3089 Allocated to Edge Hill (8A) Livery applied: All over Green including front of cab |
|
|
07/03/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Camden (1B) |
|
|
20/06/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
19/09/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Camden (1B) |
|
|
09/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rugby (1F) |
|
|
02/10/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bletchley (1E) |
|
|
18/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
13/01/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
09/03/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Liverpool Division (D08) |
|
|
01/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
06/01/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
30/08/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
12/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
12/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Removed |
|
|
10/12/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 40143 |
|
|
12/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
22/01/1985 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 40143 |
|
|
09/1986 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Crewe, Cheshire |
|
|