Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 925 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14331 Week
» 67347 Month
» 186874 Year
» 3213727 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D344 |
18/05/1961 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
40144 |
05/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
40 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
1Co-Co1 |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Works Number |
3090/D640 |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4625 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Split Headcode Box |
|
To Service |
18/05/1961 to Edge Hill (8A) |
Withdrawn |
31/05/1981 |
Time in Service |
20 yrs , 13 dys |
Cut Up |
09/1983 |
Cut At |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
All over Green including front of cab |
18/05/1961 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
by 06/1969 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 06/01/1970 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
by 30/08/1970 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
by 04/1978 |
|
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
18/05/1961 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 06/01/1970 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
by 30/08/1970 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
18/05/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D344 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 3090 Allocated to Edge Hill (8A) Livery applied: All over Green including front of cab |
|
|
12/08/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
30/12/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
06/01/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
02/10/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bletchley (1E) |
|
|
18/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
13/01/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Manchester Division (D09) |
|
|
06/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
06/01/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
09/05/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Liverpool Division (D08) |
|
|
30/08/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
05/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 40144 |
|
|
08/05/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (LO) |
|
|
04/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
31/05/1981 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 40144 |
|
|
09/1983 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|