Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 293 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18096 Week
» 71112 Month
» 190639 Year
» 3217492 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3459 |
17/06/1957 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08374 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 12/1975 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
17/06/1957 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Components
Fitted |
Component |
Details |
Removed |
Reason Removed |
17/06/1957 |
Power Unit IH3846 |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
17/06/1957 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3459 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Hither Green (73C) |
|
|
05/10/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Feltham (70B) |
|
|
02/07/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwood Junction (75C) |
|
|
17/12/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Feltham (70B) |
|
|
22/07/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Selhurst (75C) |
|
|
28/01/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hither Green (HG) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08374 |
|
|
12/1975 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
11/1981 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (WN) |
|
|
06/12/1982 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08374 from Bletchley (BY) |
|
|
09/1984 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|