Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 295 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18098 Week
» 71114 Month
» 190641 Year
» 3217494 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
496 |
m/e |
05/1921 |
British Railways |
30496 |
m/e |
12/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Urie / R. Maunsell |
Class |
S15 |
Company History |
LSWR/SR |
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Eastleigh Works |
To Service |
During 05/1921 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sun 16/06/1963 |
Service Life |
42 yrs, 1 mth , 17 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 08/1963 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
05/1921 |
FEL |
|
Feltham |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
9E |
|
Nine Elms |
9w/e |
01/06/1948 |
FEL |
|
Feltham |
5w/e |
04/02/1950 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
16/06/1963 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
NINEELMS |
Nine Elms |
9w/e |
01/06/1948 |
ALLOC |
FEL |
Feltham |
5w/e |
04/02/1950 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
16/06/1963 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1921 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 496 Built at Eastleigh Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Feltham (FEL) |
|
|
01/06/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nine Elms (9E) |
|
|
12/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30496 |
|
|
04/02/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Feltham (FEL) |
|
|
16/06/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 30496 |
|
|
08/1963 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|