Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 522 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18325 Week
» 71341 Month
» 190868 Year
» 3217721 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway |
21C114 |
m/e |
11/1945 |
British Railways |
34014 |
3w/e |
05/11/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
O. Bulleid |
Class |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
Company History |
SR |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-6-2 |
Builder |
Brighton Works |
To Service |
During 11/1945 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sun 21/03/1965 |
Service Life |
19 yrs, 4 mths , 18 dys |
Information |
Rebuilt Eastleigh Mar 1958 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 05/1966 |
Tenders
Type |
Number |
From |
Company |
Water |
Coal |
LP Series 1 |
3257 |
12/11/1945 |
SR |
4,500g |
5t 0cwt |
LP Series 2 |
3324 |
10/02/1958 |
SR |
5,500g |
5t 0cwt |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
15/03/1958 |
Rebuild - streamline casing removed, chain valve gear replaced with Walschaerts etc... |
|
Works Visits
Works |
Stopped |
Entry |
Departure |
Duration |
Level of Work |
Actual |
Mileage |
Eastleigh Works |
|
05/05/1953 |
23/05/1953 |
19 days |
Light Intermediate |
|
|
Eastleigh Works |
|
09/11/1954 |
11/12/1954 |
33 days |
General |
|
|
Eastleigh Works |
|
11/05/1956 |
16/06/1956 |
37 days |
Light Intermediate |
|
|
Eastleigh Works |
|
10/02/1958 |
15/03/1958 |
34 days |
General |
Rebuild - streamline casing removed, chain valve gear replaced with Walschaerts etc...
|
|
Eastleigh Works |
|
04/09/1959 |
19/09/1959 |
16 days |
Light Intermediate |
|
|
Bricklayers Arms (on shed) |
|
27/06/1961 |
16/08/1961 |
51 days |
Light Casual |
|
|
Eastleigh Works |
|
25/01/1963 |
09/03/1963 |
44 days |
Light Intermediate |
|
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1945 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 21C114 Built at Brighton Works |
|
|
12/11/1945 |
Tender |
Tender fitted: LP Series 1 number 3257 |
|
|
26/06/1946 |
Naming |
Named 'BUDLEIGH SALTERTON' by R Milne (Vice-Chairman Budleigh Salterton UDC) at Budleigh Salteron |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Exmouth Junction (EXJ) |
|
|
05/11/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 34014 |
|
|
05/05/1953 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 05/05/1953. Dep: 23/05/1953. |
|
|
09/11/1954 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (General) - Arr: 09/11/1954. Dep: 11/12/1954. |
|
|
11/05/1956 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 11/05/1956. Dep: 16/06/1956. |
|
|
10/02/1958 |
Tender |
Tender fitted: LP Series 2 number 3324 |
|
|
10/02/1958 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (General) - Arr: 10/02/1958. Dep: 15/03/1958. Work undertaken: Rebuild - streamline casing removed, chain valve gear replaced with Walschaerts etc...
|
|
|
24/02/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B) |
|
|
04/09/1959 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 04/09/1959. Dep: 19/09/1959. |
|
|
27/06/1961 |
Works Visit |
Depot Repair - Bricklayers Arms (Light Casual) - Arr: 27/06/1961. Dep: 16/08/1961. |
|
|
02/07/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brighton (75A) |
|
|
25/01/1963 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 25/01/1963. Dep: 09/03/1963. |
|
|
16/09/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Salisbury (70E) |
|
|
21/03/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 34014 |
|
|
05/1966 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|