12/1945 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 21C117 Built at Brighton Works |
|
|
08/12/1945 |
Tender |
Tender fitted: LP Series 1 number 3258 |
|
|
29/08/1946 |
Naming |
Named 'ILFRACOMBE' by W Carruthers Bell JP (Chairman Ilfracombe UDC) at Ilfracombe |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Exmouth Junction (EXJ) |
|
|
01/06/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 34017 |
|
|
29/08/1952 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 29/08/1952. Dep: 27/09/1952. |
|
|
22/05/1953 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 22/05/1953. Dep: 24/05/1953. Work undertaken: Driving axles examined for flaws
|
|
|
24/11/1953 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (General) - Arr: 24/11/1953. Dep: 31/12/1953. |
|
|
19/03/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A) |
|
|
26/10/1955 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 26/10/1955. Dep: 24/11/1955. |
|
|
14/10/1956 |
Works Visit |
Depot Repair - Bricklayers Arms (Light Casual) - Arr: 14/10/1956. Dep: 09/11/1956. |
|
|
08/10/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B) |
|
|
08/10/1957 |
Tender |
Tender fitted: LP Series 2 number 3360 |
|
|
08/10/1957 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (General) - Arr: 08/10/1957. Dep: 09/11/1957. Work undertaken: Rebuild - streamline casing removed, chain valve gear replaced with Walschaerts etc...
|
|
|
16/12/1957 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Ashford Works (Non Classified) - Arr: 16/12/1957. Dep: 03/01/1958. |
|
|
24/02/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ramsgate (74B) |
|
|
08/01/1959 |
Works Visit |
Depot Repair - Bricklayers Arms (Light Casual) - Arr: 08/01/1959. Dep: 02/02/1959. Work undertaken: Bricklayers Arms crossed out on card but not replaced
|
|
|
14/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B) |
|
|
11/11/1959 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 11/11/1959. Dep: 05/12/1959. |
|
|
17/01/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) |
|
|
26/09/1961 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 26/09/1961. Dep: 21/10/1961. |
|
|
21/11/1963 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (General) - Arr: 21/11/1963. Dep: 11/01/1964. |
|
|
06/01/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D) |
|
|
21/09/1964 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 21/09/1964. Dep: 09/10/1964. |
|
|
23/03/1965 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 23/03/1965. Dep: 09/04/1965. |
|
|
27/06/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) |
|
|
02/10/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 34017 |
|
|
10/1967 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|