Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 1131 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14537 Week
» 67553 Month
» 187080 Year
» 3213933 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway |
21C134 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
British Railways |
34034 |
9w/e |
01/08/1948 |
Names Carried
Date From |
Name |
07/1946 |
HONITON |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
O. Bulleid |
Class |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
Company History |
SR |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-6-2 |
Builder |
Brighton Works |
To Service |
During 07/1946 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sun 02/07/1967 |
Service Life |
21 yrs , 2 dys |
Information |
Rebuilt Eastleigh Aug 1960 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 04/1968 |
Tenders
Type |
Number |
From |
Company |
Water |
Coal |
LP Series 1 |
3287 |
11/07/1946 |
SR |
4,500g |
5t 0cwt |
LP Series 1 |
3289 |
09/1954 |
SR |
4,500g |
5t 0cwt |
LP Series 1 |
3311 |
20/09/1954 |
SR |
4,500g |
5t 0cwt |
LP Series 1 |
3273 |
22/09/1954 |
SR |
4,500g |
5t 0cwt |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
08/1960 |
Rebuild - streamline casing removed, chain valve gear replaced with Walschaerts etc... |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1946 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 21C134, name: HONITON Built at Brighton Works |
|
|
11/07/1946 |
Tender |
Tender fitted: LP Series 1 number 3287 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stewarts Lane (BAT) |
|
|
01/08/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 34034 |
|
|
06/10/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brighton (BTN) |
|
|
13/11/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Salisbury (SAL) |
|
|
09/09/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A) |
|
|
07/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A) |
|
|
09/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A) |
|
|
31/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A) |
|
|
08/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Plymouth Friary (72D) |
|
|
05/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Plymouth Friary (72D) |
|
|
19/03/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A) |
|
|
09/1954 |
Tender |
Tender fitted: LP Series 1 number 3289 |
|
|
20/09/1954 |
Tender |
Tender fitted: LP Series 1 number 3311 |
|
|
22/09/1954 |
Tender |
Tender fitted: LP Series 1 number 3273 |
|
|
08/1960 |
Modification |
Modification: Rebuild - streamline casing removed, chain valve gear replaced with Walschaerts etc... |
|
|
09/11/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A) |
|
|
27/06/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) |
|
|
02/07/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 34034 |
|
|
04/1968 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|