Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 2091 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19894 Week
» 72910 Month
» 192437 Year
» 3219290 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3470 |
26/08/1957 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08385 |
02/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
26/08/1957 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Components
Fitted |
Component |
Details |
Removed |
Reason Removed |
26/08/1957 |
Power Unit IH3848 |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
26/08/1957 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3470 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Ashford (74A) |
|
|
24/02/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hither Green (73C) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08385 |
|
|
12/09/1988 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08385 from Doncaster (DR) |
|
|
12/11/1993 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Gwent Demolition: Margam |
|
|