Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 296 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18099 Week
» 71115 Month
» 190642 Year
» 3217495 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3471 |
28/08/1957 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08386 |
02/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
28/08/1957 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Components
Fitted |
Component |
Details |
Removed |
Reason Removed |
28/08/1957 |
Power Unit IH3847 |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
28/08/1957 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3471 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Hither Green (73C) |
|
|
24/06/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Faversham (73E) |
|
|
27/01/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ashford (73F) |
|
|
10/01/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hither Green (73C) |
|
|
30/09/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To London Midland Region (91M) |
|
|
12/10/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (5A) |
|
|
05/08/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08386 |
|
|
12/07/1981 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Botanic Gardens (BG) |
|
|
22/11/1981 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (IM) |
|
|
06/01/1987 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08386 from Lincoln (LN) |
|
|
04/1990 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Vic Berry: at Lincoln MPD |
|
|