Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 1038 Today
» 1138 Yesterday
» 4741 Week
» 3479 Month
» 417800 Year
» 1639365 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D349 14/06/1961  
TOPS (Tops) 40149 08/12/1973  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 40
Subclass/Rebuild History
ClassFrom
4014/06/1961
Wheels 1Co-Co1
Builder English Electric Vulcan Foundry
Works Number 3095/D645
Fittings (as built)
Train Brakes Vacuum Brakes fitted
Steam Boiler Stone OK4625
Multiple Fitting Blue Star
Other Details Central Headcode Box
To Service 14/06/1961 to York (North) (50A)
Withdrawn 23/08/1981
Time in Service 20 yrs, 2 mths , 9 dys
Cut Up 01/05/1986
Cut At Locomotive Works (Swindon)
Information Bogie fractures
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
50A York (North) (New) on 14/06/1961
56B Healey Mills 4w/e 08/10/1966
52A Gateshead 2w/e 10/03/1973
   Withdrawn on 23/08/1981

ref_modifications
Date Modified Order Number Modification Status Charged to Capital Charged to Revenue Total Cost
11/1970   Dual Braked        

Fires
Date of Fire Severity Damage Source of Fire Material Details Location
08/09/1964 Not severe   Brake block sparks Oil impregnated dirt or waste    


Summary
Start Event Details Source See Also
14/06/1961 To Service To service as British Railways Number D349
Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 3095
Allocated to York (North) (50A)
   
08/09/1964 Fire Caught fire - Brake block sparks    
08/10/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Healey Mills (56B)    
11/1970 Modified Modification: Dual Braked    
10/03/1973 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (52A)    
08/12/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 40149 (Tops)    
23/08/1981 Withdrawn Condemned as 40149    
01/05/1986 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon    

prev prev