Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 579 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18382 Week
» 71398 Month
» 190925 Year
» 3217778 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3587 |
20/11/1958 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08472 |
02/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
08 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
To Service |
20/11/1958 to Burton (17B) |
Status |
In Service |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
20/11/1958 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
20/11/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3587 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Burton (17B) |
|
|
24/08/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
29/03/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15A) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08472 |
|
|
28/06/1981 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (SP) |
|
|