Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 1383 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14789 Week
» 67805 Month
» 187332 Year
» 3214185 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3596 |
19/09/1958 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08481 |
03/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
08 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
To Service |
19/09/1958 to Penzance (83G) |
Withdrawn |
31/08/2005 |
Time in Service |
46 yrs, 11 mths , 12 dys |
Status |
Preserved |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
by 05/1971 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 12/1975 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
10/1975 |
|
Radio telephone removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
19/09/1958 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
10/1975 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
19/09/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3596 Built at Horwich Works Allocated to Penzance (83G) |
|
|
01/11/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88B) |
|
|
03/11/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88M) |
|
|
02/11/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llanelli (87F) |
|
|
04/05/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87E) |
|
|
27/07/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Margam (87B) |
|
|
06/12/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86B) |
|
|
05/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08481 |
|
|
10/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Radio telephone removed |
|
|
12/1975 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
31/08/2005 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08481 |
|
|