Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 31 Today
» 1001 Yesterday
» 2106 Week
» 27467 Month
» 260387 Year
» 1925763 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 3607 on 02/02/1939

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 57xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 314
To Service Sat 02/02/1939
Withdrawal w/e Sat 08/10/1966
Service Life 27 yrs, 8 mths , 6 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 04/1967 at Cohens (Kettering)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 02/02/1939
84G   Kidderminster 4w/e 17/06/1961
2C   Stourbridge Junction w/e 15/08/1964
2A   Tyseley w/e 16/07/1966
     Withdrawn w/e 08/10/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 84G Kidderminster 4w/e 17/06/1961
ALLOC 2C Stourbridge Junction 4w/e 05/09/1964
ALLOC 2A Tyseley 4w/e 06/08/1966
WDN   w/e 08/10/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/12/1962 Western Regionboundary changes The following former W.R. engines were transferred to the L.M. Region when the depots to which they are allocated became the responsibility of that Region on 1.1.63. The official date of the transfer is December 30th, 1962: D3004/25-9/34-9, D3105-13/5/6/91-4, D3752/5/7, D3950-2/6-8/68-70/73-85/8/95-7, 1002/13/6/9/23/5, 1432/58, 1619/28/32/8/60/3/8, 2210/1/36/89 2845/51/6/66/75/88, 3208/9/17, 3601/5/7/19/25/31/58/60/73, 3709/44/9/70/6/8/82/8/9/92, 3802/6/9/13/5/7/21/5/8/9/31/45/6/9/52/5/7/65, 4105/11/4/20/5/33/40/7-9/53-5/8/65/7/8/71-3/5/6/8/9, 4602/17/45/6/8/65/83/7/96, 4923/46/54/98, 5022/6/31/63/89, 5101/53, 5192, 5606/40/58, 5927/42/83/90/1/4/5, 6129, 6314/64, 6403/24, 6604/9-11/5/8/25/31/2/44/6/63/7/8/71/4/8/9/83/92/4/8, 6803/11/23/7/8/30/1/3/9/42/5/51/3-5/7/8/61/2/4/6/70/1/9, 6903/4/6/7/11/5/6/7/22/5/6/9/30/3/4/52/64/71/6/9/80, 7001/12/4/9/24/6, 7207/18/36, 7414/8/24/6/31/43. 7800-3/6/7/9/10/2/8/9/21-4/7/8, 7905/8/12/5/8/29, 8109, 8464/98, 8718, 9435/63/70/98, 9608/10/3/4/24/30/6/9/46/57/69, 9724/33/53/68/74/82/93, 41201-4/9/31/2/40/1/85, 44835, 45143/5/90, 45283/98, 45406/22, 45572/7, 45660/99, 46401, 46503-27, 48330/47/54/69/402/4/10/2/5/7/8/24/30/6/50/9/60/71/4/5/8, 48724/38/9/68, 73025 6/34-6/90/5/7, 75000/2-4/6/9/20/1/3/4/6/7/9, 78000/2/3/7/8, 80070/8-80/96/8/100/l/2/4/5/31/2/5/6, 82000/3/5/6/9/20/1/31-4, 92001, 92212/3/5/27/8/34/47. SLS/196303
18/05/1963 Wolverhampton (Stafford Road) Works (In Works) In Works1424, 3607(84G), 3763, 4132/55, 4278, 4646/80, 5263, 5938/75, 6690(88J), 6900/04/16/60/88, 7210, 9790/4. Waiting Works: L92 (ex-5786), 2896, 4255, 6648. Ex Works: 8400, 6134. SLS/196304

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/02/1939 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 3607
Built at Swindon Works
   
17/06/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Kidderminster (84G)    
15/08/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Stourbridge Junction (2C)    
16/07/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Tyseley (2A)    
08/10/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 3607    
04/1967 Scrapped Broken up by Cohens: Kettering    

prev prev