Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 1529 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19332 Week
» 72348 Month
» 191875 Year
» 3218728 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D361 |
03/10/1961 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
40161 |
03/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
40 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
1Co-Co1 |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Works Number |
3107/D657 |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4625 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Central Headcode Box |
|
To Service |
03/10/1961 to Haymarket (64B) |
Withdrawn |
29/12/1980 |
Time in Service |
19 yrs, 2 mths , 26 dys |
Cut Up |
06/1981 |
Cut At |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
Information |
Due for works attention |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
All over Green including front of cab |
03/10/1961 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
by 10/1970 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
03/10/1961 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/10/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D361 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 3107 Allocated to Haymarket (64B) Livery applied: All over Green including front of cab |
|
|
10/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 40161 |
|
|
01/02/1976 |
To Store |
To Store |
|
|
06/03/1976 |
Reinstated |
Reinstated to Haymarket (HA) |
|
|
29/12/1980 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 40161 |
|
|
06/1981 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|