Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 88 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 14131 Week
» 79085 Month
» 281749 Year
» 3308602 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D363 |
18/10/1961 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
40163 |
04/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
40 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
1Co-Co1 |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Works Number |
3109/D659 |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4625 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Central Headcode Box |
|
To Service |
18/10/1961 to Haymarket (64B) |
Withdrawn |
06/06/1982 |
Time in Service |
20 yrs, 7 mths , 19 dys |
Cut Up |
02/1987 |
Cut At |
Vic Berry (Leicester) |
Information |
Power unit damage |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
All over Green including front of cab |
18/10/1961 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 04/1978 |
|
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
|
|
09/1978 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
18/10/1961 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
09/1978 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
18/10/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D363 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 3109 Allocated to Haymarket (64B) Livery applied: All over Green including front of cab |
|
|
29/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
30/05/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 40163 |
|
|
04/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
09/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
06/06/1982 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 40163 |
|
|
02/1987 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Vic Berry: Leicester |
|
|