Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 292 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18095 Week
» 71111 Month
» 190638 Year
» 3217491 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3671 |
26/03/1959 |
|
TOPS (09/0) |
09007 |
01/1974 |
|
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
31/01/1973 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Components
Fitted |
Component |
Details |
Removed |
Reason Removed |
26/03/1959 |
Power Unit IH4342 |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
26/03/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3671 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Hither Green (73C) |
|
|
14/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Faversham (73E) |
|
|
27/01/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ashford (73F) |
|
|
30/09/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hither Green (73C) |
|
|
31/01/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
01/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 09007 |
|
|