Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 798 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18601 Week
» 71617 Month
» 191144 Year
» 3217997 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
3680 |
on |
15/07/1940 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
57xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-0PT |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
325 |
To Service |
Wed 15/07/1940 |
Withdrawal |
Wed 06/05/1964 |
Service Life |
23 yrs, 9 mths , 21 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 07/1964 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
on |
15/07/1940 |
ABEEG |
|
Aberbeeg |
on |
15/06/1947 (Snapshot) |
86J |
|
Aberdare |
4w/e |
05/09/1953 |
86D |
|
Llantrisant |
4w/e |
17/07/1954 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
06/05/1964 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
86J |
Aberdare |
4w/e |
05/09/1953 |
ALLOC |
86D |
Llantrisant |
4w/e |
17/07/1954 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
06/05/1964 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
15/07/1940 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 3680 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Aberbeeg (ABEEG) |
|
|
05/09/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aberdare (86J) |
|
|
17/07/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llantrisant (86D) |
|
|
06/05/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 3680 |
|
|
07/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|