Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 832 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 6232 Week
» 24284 Month
» 257204 Year
» 1922580 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 3681 on 18/07/1940

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 57xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 325
To Service Mon 18/07/1940
Withdrawal w/e Mon 07/03/1966
Service Life 25 yrs, 7 mths , 17 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 08/1966 at Cashmore's (Newport)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 18/07/1940
88B   Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 20/05/1950
88D   Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 22/02/1958
86A   Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 31/10/1959
82F   Bath Green Park (S&D) 6w/e 12/10/1964
     Withdrawn w/e 07/03/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 88B Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 20/05/1950
ALLOC 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 22/02/1958
ALLOC 88A Radyr 4w/e 31/10/1959
ALLOC 85B Gloucester Horton Road 3w/e 14/09/1964
ALLOC 82F Bath Green Park (S&D) 3w/e 05/10/1964
WDN   3w/e 12/03/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
18/07/1940 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 3681
Built at Swindon Works
   
20/05/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88B)    
22/02/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
31/10/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A)    
12/10/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Bath Green Park (S&D) (82F)    
07/03/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 3681    
08/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev