Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 27 Online
» 3668 Today
» 4916 Yesterday
» 13242 Week
» 78196 Month
» 280860 Year
» 3307713 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3686 |
18/09/1958 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08524 |
04/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
18/09/1958 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
18/09/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3686 Built at Doncaster Works Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) |
|
|
05/05/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gorton (9G) |
|
|
12/06/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
12/11/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (9D) |
|
|
06/07/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
12/05/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (NH) |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08524 |
|
|
06/01/1986 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08524 from Longsight (LO) |
|
|
12/1987 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|