Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 216 Today
» 997 Yesterday
» 3248 Week
» 21300 Month
» 254220 Year
» 1919596 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 3690 on 15/02/1941

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 57xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 330
To Service Wed 15/02/1941
Withdrawal Wed 16/06/1965
Service Life 24 yrs, 4 mths , 1 dy

Disposal
Scrapping During 10/1965

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 15/02/1941
PPRD   Pontypool Road 8w/e 23/03/1946
86F   Tondu 4w/e 01/12/1951
87F   Llanelly 4w/e 31/12/1951
88C   Barry 4w/e 19/05/1962
88D   Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 30/11/1963
87A   Neath (Court Sart) w/e 08/11/1964
     Withdrawn on 16/06/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC PPRD Pontypool Road 4w/e 23/02/1946
ALLOC 86F Tondu 4w/e 01/12/1951
ALLOC 88C Barry 4w/e 19/05/1962
TOSTORE   4w/e 09/02/1963
ALLOC 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 30/11/1963
ALLOC 87A Neath (Court Sart) 3w/e 02/11/1964
TOSTORE   4w/e 13/06/1965
WDN   on 16/06/1965
WDN   4w/e 11/07/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
15/02/1941 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 3690
Built at Swindon Works
   
23/03/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Pontypool Road (PPRD)    
01/12/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Tondu (86F)    
31/12/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Llanelly (87F)    
19/05/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Barry (88C)    
30/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
08/11/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Neath (Court Sart) (87A)    
16/06/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 3690    
10/1965 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev