Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 276 Today
» 825 Yesterday
» 1977 Week
» 10092 Month
» 137535 Year
» 1802911 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3696 28/04/1959  
TOPS (Tops) 08534 02/1974  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 08
Subclass/Rebuild History
ClassFrom
0828/04/1959
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
To Service 28/04/1959 to Sheffield Darnall (41A)
Withdrawn 31/08/2005
Time in Service 46 yrs, 4 mths , 3 dys
Cut Up 31/05/2007
Cut At T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
41A Sheffield Darnall (New) on 28/04/1959
16D Annesley w/e 12/05/1962
16A Nottingham w/e 04/08/1962
16E Kirkby in Ashfield w/e 19/03/1966
16F Burton w/e 14/10/1967
16A Toton w/e 28/02/1970
9A Longsight w/e 08/05/1971
8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 24/02/1973
SP Springs Branch (Wigan) on 04/09/1988
   Withdrawn on 31/08/2005

Components
Fitted Component Details Removed Reason Removed
28/04/1959 Power Unit IH4351    


Summary
Start Event Details Source See Also
28/04/1959 To Service To service as British Railways Number 3696
Built at Darlington Works
Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A)
   
12/05/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (16D)    
04/08/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Nottingham (16A)    
19/03/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Kirkby in Ashfield (16E)    
14/10/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Burton (16F)    
28/02/1970 Allocation Reallocated to Toton (16A)    
08/05/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Longsight (9A)    
24/02/1973 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
02/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 08534    
04/09/1988 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (SP)    
31/08/2005 Withdrawn Condemned as 08534    
31/05/2007 Scrapped Broken up by T J Thomson and Son Ltd.: Stockton    

prev prev