Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 817 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 6217 Week
» 24269 Month
» 257189 Year
» 1922565 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 3707 on 21/10/1936

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 57xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 299
To Service Mon 21/10/1936
Withdrawal Mon 07/09/1964
Service Life 27 yrs, 10 mths , 17 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 01/1965

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 21/10/1936
88E   Abercynon 4w/e 10/09/1955
88D   Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 30/11/1963
     Withdrawn on 07/09/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 88E Abercynon 4w/e 10/09/1955
ALLOC 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 30/11/1963
WDN   3w/e 14/09/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
02/04/1948 Barry Works On 2/4 the following were observed in the Erecting Shop:-Nos. 344, 3707/14/75, 5608/19/60, 6669, 6754 an 9789, while out-side were:-Nos. 414, 1993, 5630, 6680, 6700 an 8748. SLS/194805

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
21/10/1936 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 3707
Built at Swindon Works
   
10/09/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Abercynon (88E)    
30/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
07/09/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 3707    
01/1965 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev