Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1431 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19234 Week
» 72250 Month
» 191777 Year
» 3218630 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3740 |
05/06/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08573 |
03/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
05/06/1959 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/06/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3740 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Dalry Road (64C) |
|
|
04/07/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) |
|
|
15/10/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12B) |
|
|
04/03/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A) |
|
|
13/01/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
09/06/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (KM) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08573 |
|
|
18/05/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (DY) |
|
|