Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 34 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 4661 Week
» 6399 Month
» 133842 Year
» 1799218 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3784 12/09/1959  
TOPS (Tops) 08617 09/1973  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 08
Subclass/Rebuild History
ClassFrom
0812/09/1959
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Derby Works
To Service 12/09/1959 to Newton Heath (26A)
Status In Service

Allocations
Code Name Date From
26A Newton Heath (New) on 12/09/1959
9A Longsight w/e 06/07/1968
12A Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 09/10/1971
12C Barrow in Furness w/e 08/01/1972
8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 26/02/1972
TO Toton w/e 07/09/1974
WN Willesden (Reinstated) m/e 04/1984


Summary
Start Event Details Source See Also
12/09/1959 To Service To service as British Railways Number 3784
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to Newton Heath (26A)
   
06/07/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Longsight (9A)    
09/10/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A)    
08/01/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Barrow in Furness (12C)    
26/02/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
09/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 08617    
07/09/1974 Allocation Reallocated to Toton (TO)    
04/1984 Reinstated Reinstated to Willesden (WN)    

prev prev