Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 4138 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17544 Week
» 70560 Month
» 190087 Year
» 3216940 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3799 |
05/12/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08632 |
02/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
08 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
05/12/1959 to Stoke (5D) |
Status |
In Service |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
05/12/1959 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/12/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3799 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Stoke (5D) |
|
|
26/12/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Northampton (2E) |
|
|
23/01/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke (5D) |
|
|
28/01/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
25/11/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (5A) |
|
|
27/05/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
10/06/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08632 |
|
|